Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lessard, Serge (CPSO#: 70271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3591 Innes Rd
Ottawa ON  K1C 1T1
Phone: (613) 590-7249
Fax: (613) 824-5538
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 3916
Fax: (613) 748-4938
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Lessard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2008


Corporation Name: Serge Lessard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lessard ( CPSO# 70271 )

Business Address:
Introspect Clinic
3591 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 590-7249

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERGE LESSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESSARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003