Lesser, Sharolyn Ruth (CPSO#: 60685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway #2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 4317
Fax: 905 721-6179
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shari Lesser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lesser ( CPSO# 60685 )

Business Address:
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway #2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 721-4317

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAROLYN RUTH LESSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESSER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1990