Lester, Steven Jay (CPSO#: 63919)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Oct 2000


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Oct 2000