Leswick, David Allen (CPSO#: 78577)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 05 May 2003 to 30 May 2003
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2003