Leszcz, Molyn (CPSO#: 32416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue, Room 925
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4555
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 College St
Toronto ON  M5S2S1
Canada
Phone: 4165864800 Ext. 4555
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Molyn Leszcz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leszcz ( CPSO# 32416 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room 925 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOLYN LESZCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESZCZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1981