Letovsky, Eric (CPSO#: 31299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Letovsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Letovsky ( CPSO# 31299 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC LETOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1980