Letts, Robert Mervyn (CPSO#: 21796)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario, 401 Smyth Road, Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 05 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Mar 2015