Letwin, Kenneth Michael (CPSO#: 69220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 725-5443
Fax: (705) 725-5442
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth M. Letwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2007


Corporation Name: Kenneth M. Letwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Letwin ( CPSO# 69220 )

Business Address:
125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 206
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 725-5443

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH MICHAEL LETWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000