Leu, Eric Du Hou (CPSO#: 61085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Korean, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Markham Medical Centre
2002 Middlefield Road
Unit 6
Markham ON  L3S 1Y5
Phone: (905) 201-8222
Fax: (905) 201-8238
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC DU HOU LEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990