Leung, Alfred Ki-Wai (CPSO#: 29727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
The Tannery Centre
465 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P1
Phone: (905) 853-1031
Fax: (905) 853-1031
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

325 Bamburgh Circle
Scarborough ON  M1W 3Y1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFRED KI-WAI LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Nov 1984
Summary:

 In November 1984, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Leung guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 26(20) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Leung be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also 
 ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months, but that this 
 suspension would itself be suspended if Dr. Leung permitted an inspection of his practice, within 
 three months from the date on which this Order became final, by inspectors appointed by the 
 Registrar.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Nov 1984