Leung, Andrea Karen (CPSO#: 86215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 701
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone: (905) 338-3937
Fax: (905) 338-3930
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
Eye Clinic
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 338-3937
Fax: (905) 338-3930
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea K. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Leung ( CPSO# 86215 )

Business Address:
701 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 338-3937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA KAREN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013