Leung, Andrew Edward (CPSO#: 72224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
C 1 649
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8572
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew E. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Leung ( CPSO# 72224 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite C-1-649
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW EDWARD LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2004