Leung, Ceta Gen Man Yee (CPSO#: 62655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4023 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 1S7
Phone: (416) 609-9072
Fax: (416) 609-3193
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ceta Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leung ( CPSO# 62655 )

Business Address:
4023 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 1S7
Phone Number: (416) 609-9072

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CETA GEN MAN YEE LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1991