Leung, Christina Chi Wai (CPSO#: 85046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christina Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leung ( CPSO# 85046 )

Business Address:
Suite 198
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3P6
Phone Number: (519) 252-0382

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA CHI WAI LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011