Leung, Chung Shan (CPSO#: 63090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Room 4SE - 108
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6252
Fax: (416) 756-4294
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Gamma-Dynacare Medical Laboratories
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-3000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. S. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leung ( CPSO# 63090 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Room 4SE-108
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6252

Business Address:
Gamma-Dynacare Medical Laboratories
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHUNG SHAN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1994