Leung, Deborah Ka Bo (CPSO#: 88525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: 705-789-2311
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leung & Yang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leung ( CPSO# 88525 )
Dr. T. Yang ( CPSO# 96174 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room C753
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH KA BO LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2011 to 03 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011