Leung, Edmond Yiu-Hang (CPSO#: 30869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dragon City X-ray & Ultrasound
Toronto ON  M5T 3A5
Phone: (416) 603-1197
Fax: (416) 603-1199
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edmond Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leung ( CPSO# 30869 )

Business Address:
306 - 280 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 3A5
Phone Number: (416) 603-1197

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDMOND YIU-HANG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1984