Leung, Elaine Wing-Yin (CPSO#: 72987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
Department of Laboratory Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2422
Fax: (613) 738-4819
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE WING-YIN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 1998 to 14 Sep 1998
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 20 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2004 to 14 Mar 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2005 to 14 Mar 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006