Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Leung, Ellen Pui Ngor (CPSO#: 66204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Unit 9
Mississauga ON  L5C 4E6
Phone: (905) 281-9337
Fax: (905) 281-9849
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen P.N. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leung ( CPSO# 66204 )

Business Address:
9 - 1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4E6
Phone Number: (905) 281-9337

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLEN PUI NGOR LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1993 to 25 May 1993
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996