Leung, Gabriel Matthew (CPSO#: 70649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6/F William MW Mong Block
21 Sassoon Road
Pokfulam HK
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 852 39179210
Fax: 852 28187562

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jul 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIEL MATTHEW LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998