Leung, Henry (CPSO#: 59969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4615
Fax: (705) 256-3494
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4733-49 Street
Red Deer AB  T4N 1T6
Canada
Phone: (403) 340-7046
Fax: (403) 340-7622
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1988