Leung, Jessica Ellen (CPSO#: 85055)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 25 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services, 111 St Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 28 Feb 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Feb 2017