Leung, Joe Bunn (CPSO#: 61048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2462 Howard Avenue
Apartment 102
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-4600
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung ( CPSO# 61048 )

Business Address:
102 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 258-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOE BUNN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990