Leung, Kelvin Wing-Ming (CPSO#: 65257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4A
62 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C4
Phone: (416) 425-8800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kelvin W. M. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leung ( CPSO# 65257 )

Business Address:
Unit 4A
62 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 425-8800

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 10 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., February 10, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints
            and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Kelvin Wing-Ming Leung:

            Practice Restriction

            (i)   Dr. Leung shall not perform hemorrhoid procedures.

            Posting a Sign (Practice Restriction)

            (ii)  Dr. Leung shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) of all his Practice
                  Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out
                  at Appendix "A."  For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:
                  "Dr. Leung must not perform hemorrhoid procedures. Further information
                  may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website
                  at www.cpso.on.ca".

            (iii) Dr. Leung shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described above in the waiting
                  room(s) of all his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
                  location, in the form set out at Appendix "A." 

            (iv)  Dr. Leung shall provide the certified translation(s) to the College
                  within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.

            (v)   If Dr. Leung elects, after the date of this Order, to provide services in
                  any other language(s), he will notify the College prior to providing any
                  such services. 

            (vi)  Dr. Leung shall provide to the College the certified translation(s) prior
                  to beginning to provide services in the language(s) described in (v)
                  above.

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (vii) Dr. Leung shall not engage in any professional encounters of any kind
                  (the "Patient Encounter") with patients, unless the Patient Encounter
                  takes place in the continuous presence of and under the continuous
                  observation of a monitor who is a regulated health professional
                  acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other
                  requirements provided in this Order are fulfilled. For further clarity,
                  Dr. Leung may not be alone with any patient, for any length of time,
                  during any professional encounter of any kind.

            (viii)At all times, Dr. Leung shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  (a)   Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking) to the College on a monthly basis; 
                  
                  (b)   Remain present at all times during all Patient Encounters, even if
                        another person is accompanying the patient, and carefully observing
                        all of Dr. Leung's  Patient Encounters including, but not limited
                        to, physical examinations.  It is Dr. Leung's obligation to ensure
                        that the Practice Monitor's view of his examinations is
                        unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                  (c)   Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in
                        the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "B", while
                        observing all Patient Encounters;
                  
                  (d)   Maintain a log of all Patient Encounters in the form attached as
                        Appendix "C" (the "Log");
                  
                  (e)   Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the Log; and
                  
                  (f)   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis.
                  
            (ix)  Dr. Leung shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request.

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (x)   Dr. Leung shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practices or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, he
                  shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                  five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

            Posting a Sign (Practice Monitor)

            (xi)  Dr. Leung shall post a sign in his waiting room(s) and each of his
                  examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in
                  a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as
                  Appendix "D" that states: "Dr. Kelvin Wing-Ming Leung must not have any
                  professional encounters with any patients, unless in the continuous
                  presence of and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                  acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr.
                  Kelvin Wing-Ming Leung must not be alone with any patients in any
                  examination or consulting room. Further information may be found on the
                  College website at www.cpso.on.ca." 

            (xii) Dr. Leung shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in (xi) above, in his
                  waiting room(s) and each of his examination and/or consulting rooms, in
                  all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location.

            (xiii)Dr. Leung shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (xii)
                  above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order.

            Notifying Patients

            (xiv) Dr. Leung is to directly notify each patient scheduled for an appointment
                  with him, prior to the appointment, and at least within seven (7) days
                  after the appointment is booked, of the details of the restriction
                  described in section (vii) above.

            Intimate Examination Log

            (xv)  Dr. Leung shall maintain an up-to-date daily log listing every patient
                  seen by him in his family practice, including the patient's name, date of
                  birth, OHIP number, date of appointment or visit, reason for visit, any
                  intimate examination(s) conducted and the indication for the examination
                  in the form attached as Appendix "E" (the "Intimate Examination Log").  

            (xvi) Dr. Leung shall ensure that his Practice Monitor verifies the accuracy of
                  each entry and initials the Intimate Examination Log after every patient
                  encounter.

            Clinical Supervision: Indication for Intimate Examinations

            (xvii)Dr. Leung shall practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor(s)
                  acceptable to the College in respect of the indication for intimate
                  examinations in his family medicine practice (the "Clinical
                  Supervisor(s)"), at his own expense.

            (xviii)Dr. Leung shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor(s) once every two
                  weeks, which shall consist of the Clinical Supervisor reviewing Dr.
                  Leung's Intimate Examination Log, with reports to be provided to the
                  College at least monthly by the Clinical Supervisor(s).  The Clinical
                  Supervisor shall examine the relevant patient charts if and when there is
                  concern about the indication of any intimate examination conducted.

            (xix) Dr. Leung shall provide his Clinical Supervisor(s) with full access to
                  his OHIP billings, his appointment scheduling book/program, and the
                  Intimate Examination Log.  He shall maintain the original Intimate
                  Examination Log and shall send a copy to the College at the end of every
                  calendar month.

            (xx)  Dr. Leung shall ensure that the undertaking of the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                  attached at Appendix "F" to this Order is delivered to the College within
                  ten (10) days of the date of this Order.  If Dr. Leung has not delivered
                  the Clinical Supervisor(s)' undertaking to the College by that date, Dr.
                  Leung shall cease to practise family medicine until delivery of the
                  undertaking, and the fact that he has done so will constitute a term,
                  condition or limitation on his certificate of registration.

            (xxi) Dr. Leung shall fully cooperate with the clinical supervision of his
                  family medicine practice, and shall abide by any recommendations of his
                  Clinical Supervisor(s).  

            (xxii)If a Clinical Supervisor(s) who has given an undertaking in Appendix "F"
                  to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfil its terms, Dr.
                  Leung shall, within ten (10) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an
                  executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person
                  who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                  College within that time.  

            (xxiii)If Dr. Leung is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance
                  with paragraph (xxii) of this Order, he shall cease practising family
                  medicine immediately until such time as he has done so, and the fact that
                  he has done so will constitute a term, condition or limitation on his
                  certificate of registration until that time.

            Monitoring

            (xxiv)Dr. Leung shall consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Leung's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            (xxv) Dr. Leung shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Leung's compliance with the terms of
                  this Order;

            (xxvi)Dr. Leung shall consent to the College providing any and all information
                  to the Practice Monitor and Clinical Supervisor that the College deems
                  necessary or desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor and
                  Clinical Supervisor in fulfilling their Undertakings and in order to
                  monitor Dr. Leung's compliance with the terms of this Order;

            (xxvii)     Dr. Leung shall consent to all Practice Monitors and Clinical
                        Supervisor to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                        information relevant to this Order, relevant to the terms of the
                        Practice Monitor's or Clinical Supervisor's Undertaking and/or
                        relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Leung's compliance with
                        this Order; and

            (xxviii) Dr. Leung shall consent to the College providing the Order to any
            Chief(s) of Staff, or acolleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice
                  Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of his compliance with this Order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Dec 2017
Summary:

On December 11, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kelvin Wing-Ming Leung 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that:  he has he has failed to maintain the standard 
of practice of the profession; and, he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional. 
 
Disposition 
 
On December 11, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
 -  the Registrar suspend Dr. Leung’s Certificate of Registration for a two month period 
    commencing December 18, 2017. 
     
 -  the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Leung’s Certificate 
    of Registration: 
 
    a) Practice Restriction 
        
       (i)  Dr. Leung shall not perform hemorrhoid procedures. 
           
       Posting a Sign (Practice Restriction) 
        
       (ii) Dr. Leung shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) of all his Practice Locations, in a 
            clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.”  For further 
            clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Leung must not perform hemorrhoid 
            procedures. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and 
            Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”. 
       (iii) Dr. Leung shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which he provides 
            services, of the sign described above in the waiting room(s) of all his Practice 
            Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix 
            “A.”  
       (iv) Dr. Leung shall provide the certified translation(s) to the College within thirty (30) 
            days of the date of this Order. 
       (v)  If Dr. Leung elects, after the date of this Order, to provide services in any other 
            language(s), he will notify the College prior to providing any such services.  
       (vi) Dr. Leung shall provide to the College the certified translation(s) prior to beginning 
            to provide services in the language(s) described in (v) above. 
 
   b) Practice Monitor and Patient Log 
       
       (i) Dr. Leung shall not engage in any professional encounters of any kind (the “Patient 
           Encounter”) with patients, unless the Patient Encounter takes place in the continuous 
           presence of and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated 
           health professional acceptable to the College (the “Practice Monitor”).  
       (ii) At all times, Dr. Leung shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall: 
            (a) Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking) to the College 
           on a monthly basis;  
         (b) Remain present at all times during all Patient Encounters, even if another person 
           is accompanying the patient, and carefully observing all of Dr. Leung’s  Patient 
           Encounters including, but not limited to, physical examinations.  It is Dr. Leung’s 
           obligation to ensure that the Practice Monitor’s view of his examinations is 
           unobstructed at all times;  
         (c) Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in the Practice 
           Monitor’s undertaking attached as Appendix “B”, while observing all Patient 
           Encounters; 
         (d) Maintain a log of all Patient Encounters in the form attached as Appendix “C” 
           (the “Log”); 
         (e) Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the Log; and 
         (f) Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis. 
    (iii) Dr. Leung shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make it available to 
         the College upon request. 
          
          
  Posting a Sign (Practice Monitor) 
            
  (iv) Dr. Leung shall post a sign in his waiting room(s) and each of his examination and/or 
       consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure 
       location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix “D” that states: “Dr. Kelvin Wing-
       Ming Leung must not have any professional encounters with any patients unless under 
       the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians 
       and Surgeons of Ontario. Further information may be found on the College website at 
       www.cpso.on.ca.”  
  (v)  Dr. Leung shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which he provides 
       services, of the sign described in (xi) above, in his waiting room(s) and each of his 
       examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly 
       visible and secure location. 
  (vi) Dr. Leung shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (xii) above to the 
       College within 30 days of the date of this Order. 
   
  Notifying Patients 
               
  (vii) Dr. Leung is to directly notify each patient scheduled for an appointment with him, prior 
       to the appointment, and at least within seven (7) days after the appointment is booked, 
       of the details of the restriction described in section b(i) above or section d(ii) below. 
            
            
c) Clinical Supervision: Indication for Intimate Examinations 
    
   Intimate Examination Log 
    
   (i)   Dr. Leung shall maintain an up-to-date daily log listing every patient seen by him in 
         his family practice, including the patient’s name, date of birth, OHIP number, date of 
         appointment or visit, reason for visit, any intimate examination(s) conducted and the 
         indication for the examination in the form attached as Appendix “E” (the “Intimate 
         Examination Log”).   
   (ii)  Dr. Leung shall ensure that his Practice Monitor verifies the accuracy of each entry 
         and initials the Intimate Examination Log after every patient encounter. 
          
   Supervision 
    
   (iii) For a period of six months from the date of resumption of practice following 
         suspension, Dr. Leung shall practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor(s) 
         acceptable to the College in respect of the indication for intimate examinations in his 
         family medicine practice (the “Clinical Supervisor(s)”), at his own expense. 
   (iv)  Dr. Leung shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor(s) once every two weeks, which 
         shall consist of the Clinical Supervisor reviewing Dr. Leung’s Intimate Examination 
         Log, with reports to be provided to the College at least monthly by the Clinical 
         Supervisor(s).  The Clinical Supervisor shall examine the relevant patient charts if 
         and when there is concern about the indication of any intimate examination 
         conducted.  
   (v)   Dr. Leung shall provide his Clinical Supervisor(s) with full access to his OHIP 
         billings, his appointment scheduling book/program, and the Intimate Examination 
         Log.  He shall maintain the original Intimate Examination Log and shall send a copy 
         to the College at the end of every calendar month. 
   (vi)  Dr. Leung shall ensure that the undertaking of the Clinical Supervisor(s) attached at 
         Appendix “F” to this Order is delivered to the College within ten (10) days of the 
         date of this Order.  If Dr. Leung has not delivered the Clinical Supervisor(s)’ 
         undertaking to the College by that date, Dr. Leung shall cease to practise family 
         medicine until delivery of the undertaking, and the fact that he has done so will 
         constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration.  
   (vii) Dr. Leung shall fully cooperate with the clinical supervision of his family medicine 
         practice, and shall abide by any recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor(s).   
   (viii) If a Clinical Supervisor(s) who has given an undertaking in Appendix “F” to this 
         Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfil its terms, Dr. Leung shall, within 
         ten (10) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the 
         same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and 
         ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.   
   (ix)  If Dr. Leung is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance with this Order, 
         he shall cease practising family medicine immediately until such time as he has done 
         so, and the fact that he has done so will constitute a term, condition or limitation on 
         his certificate of registration until that time. 
            
d) Reassessments 
    
   Six Month Reassessment 
    
   i) At six (6) months following from the date of resumption of practice following 
      suspension, Dr. Leung shall submit to an assessment of his practice by an assessor or 
      assessors selected by the College (the “Assessment”).  The Assessment may include 
      chart reviews, direct observation of Dr. Leung’s care, interviews with colleagues and co-
      workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.  
      Dr. Leung shall abide by all recommendations made by the assessor(s), and the results of 
      the Assessment will be reported to the College and may form the basis of further action 
      by the College; 
   ii) In the event the reassessment is positive, the practice restriction set out at b(vii) above 
      can be varied to: Dr. Leung shall not engage in any breast, pelvic, genital, urinary, 
      perineal, perianal and rectal examinations  of  patients, unless the examination  takes 
      place in the continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a monitor 
      who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the “Practice 
      Monitor”).  
   iii) If and when the role of the practice monitor is reduced, Dr. Leung shall post a sign in his 
      waiting room(s) and each of his examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of his 
      Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as 
      Appendix “G” that states: “Dr. Kelvin Wing-Ming Leung must not conduct breast, 
      genital, urinary, or rectal examinations except under the continuous observation of a 
      practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. 
      Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca.”  
   iv) The Undertaking of the Practice Monitor is attached at Appendix “H” to this Order. 
    
   Eighteen Month Reassessment 
    
    v) At eighteen (18) months following from the date of resumption of practice following 
       suspension, Dr. Leung shall submit to a further assessment of his practice by an assessor 
       or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessment”).  The Assessment may include 
       chart reviews, direct observation of Dr. Leung’s care, interviews with colleagues and 
       co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the 
       College.  Dr. Leung shall abide by all recommendations made by the assessor(s), and 
       the results of the Assessment will be reported to the College and may form the basis of 
       further action by the College; 
    vi) In the event the reassessment is positive, Dr. Leung will no longer be required to 
       conduct breast, pelvic, genital, urinary, perineal, perianal and rectal examinations in the 
       presence of a practice monitor. 
        
e) Education 
    
    i) Dr. Leung will successfully complete, within six months of the date of this Order, a one 
       on one educational session to address the sensitivity of patients with regards to intimate 
       examinations. 
    ii)  Dr. Leung will successfully complete instruction in medical record keeping within six 
       months of the date of this Order. 
        
        
        
        
f)  Costs 
    
   i)  Dr. Leung shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the 
       terms of this Order. 
    
g) Monitoring 
    
   (i)   Dr. Leung shall inform the College of each and every location that he practices or 
         has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any 
         jurisdiction (collectively the “Practice Location(s)”), within five (5) days of this 
         Order.  Going forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice 
         Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location. 
   (ii)  Dr. Leung shall consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario 
         Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who may have relevant 
         information in order for the College to monitor Dr. Leung’s compliance with the 
         terms of this Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be necessary for 
         the College to obtain information from these persons or institutions; 
   (iii) Dr. Leung shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his 
         Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any 
         other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Leung’s 
         compliance with the terms of this Order; 
   (iv)  Dr. Leung shall consent to the College providing any and all information to the 
         Practice Monitor and Clinical Supervisor that the College deems necessary or 
         desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor and Clinical Supervisor in fulfilling 
         their Undertakings and in order to monitor Dr. Leung’s compliance with the terms of 
         this Order; 
   (v)   Dr. Leung shall consent to all Practice Monitors and Clinical Supervisor to disclose 
         to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Order, relevant to 
         the terms of the Practice Monitor’s or Clinical Supervisor’s Undertaking and/or 
         relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Leung’s compliance with this Order; and 
   (vi)  Dr. Leung shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, 
         or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where he 
         practices or has privileges (“Chief(s) of Staff”), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff 
         with any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any information 
         arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order. 
   
-  Dr. Leung appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
    
-  Dr. Leung pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of the 
   date of this Order.

Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: December 11, 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)