Leung, Kwok Hung (CPSO#: 54016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 105
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T7
Phone: (416) 298-2088
Fax: (416) 298-2188
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWOK HUNG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1985