Leung, Mark (CPSO#: 84934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 922-0840
Fax: (416) 922-2818
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

David L. Macintosh Sport Medicine
Clinic
110 Devonshire Place, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 2W6
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-4678
Fax: (416) 971-2846
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cleveland Clinic Canada Midtown
5th Floor
150 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Canada
Phone: (416) 481-1601
Fax: (416) 481-1267
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Mark Leung & Harmony Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leung ( CPSO# 84934 )
Dr. H. Ho ( CPSO# 82674 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 992-0840

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008