Leung, Nathalie Mee Chu (CPSO#: 70213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212A
9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5G2
Phone: (905) 770-8034
Fax: (905) 770-5637
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Leung ( CPSO# 70213 )

Business Address:
Suite 212A
9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5G2
Phone Number: (905) 770-8034

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE MEE CHU LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2001