Leung, Philemon Ho-Yan (CPSO#: 108178)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2016 to 25 Sep 2016
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 05 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2017 to 24 Sep 2017
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2017