Leung, Randy Man Hymn (CPSO#: 82943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite 402
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 728-8066
Fax: (705) 725-7330
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Randy Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Leung ( CPSO# 82943 )

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8066

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDY MAN HYMN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011