Leung, Richard Sei Tza (CPSO#: 66780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond Street
Room 6-045 Bond Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6026
Fax: (416) 864-5649
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
Suite 1011
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-2277
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD SEI TZA LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1999