Leung, Rico Park Ning (CPSO#: 86797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rico Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Leung ( CPSO# 86797 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICO PARK NING LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012