Leung, Sophia So Yin (CPSO#: 31007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: Mok, Sophia So Yin (used until: 18 Jun 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 213
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 569-0103
Fax: (905) 569-0104
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophia Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Leung ( CPSO# 31007 )

Business Address:
213 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 569-0103

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIA SO YIN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1979