Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Leung, Terence Luen Ngok (CPSO#: 55743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1287 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1Y5
Phone: (416) 463-4220
Fax: 647-776-2909
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Terence Luen-Ngok Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Leung ( CPSO# 55743 )

Business Address:
1287 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1Y5
Phone Number: (416) 463-4220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERENCE LUEN NGOK LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1986