Leung, Winnie Wing-Chi (CPSO#: 66796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Ave East
Suite 402
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 291-1900
Fax: (416) 291-9469
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4040 Finch Ave east, Suite 105
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 293-9402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lo Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leung ( CPSO# 66796 )
Dr. J. Lo ( CPSO# 66798 )

Business Address:
402 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 291-1900

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINNIE WING-CHI LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1999