Leung, Yuen Lun (CPSO#: 68735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8, 360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone: (905) 881-0900
Fax: (905)881-0906
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yuen L. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2003

Dr. Y. Leung ( CPSO# 68735 )

Business Address:
360 Highway 7 East
Unit 8
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone Number: (905) 881-0900

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd., Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Jun 2015

Address: Records Management Ltd., Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. YUEN LUN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996