Levasseur, Joseph Yvan Jacques (CPSO#: 16111)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 May 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Oct 1994