Levasseur, Stephanie Malika (CPSO#: 74045)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: French

Education:Laval University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Apr 2004