Leveck, David Eugene (CPSO#: 80813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4242
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leveck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leveck ( CPSO# 80813 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4242

Business Address:
St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6882

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID EUGENE LEVECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVECK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006