Levene, Donald Lyon (CPSO#: 23127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Veterans Administration Medical
Center of North Texas
Department of Cardiology
4500 South Lancaster Road
Dallas TX  75216
United States
Phone: (214) 801-9231

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD LYON LEVENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016