Levene, Richard Gordon (CPSO#: 57286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard G. Levene Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levene ( CPSO# 57286 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD GORDON LEVENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1988