Levenstadt, Jeremy Stephen (CPSO#: 93078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4-407 Laurier Ave W
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Phone: (613) 702-5371
Fax: (613) 702-0490
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

421 Rideau St
Ottawa ON  K1N 5Y9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levenstadt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Levenstadt ( CPSO# 93078 )

Business Address:
4 - 407 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Phone Number: (613) 702-5371

Business Address:
421 Rideau Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5Y9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY STEPHEN LEVENSTADT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENSTADT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012