Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lever, Malcolm Aspinal (CPSO#: 11046)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Apr 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1942

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1942
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 1990