Levere, Kevin Christopher (CPSO#: 74631)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2000 to 26 May 2000
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2002 to 04 Mar 2002
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 May 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2002