Levesque, Annie Joanne (CPSO#: 95825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique médicale Asclepios
570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N9
Phone: 613-830-8388
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CSCE
738 Notre-Dame Street
Embrun ON  K0A 1W1
Canada
Phone: 613-443-3888
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annie Levesque Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Levesque ( CPSO# 95825 )

Business Address:
Clinique Medicale Asclepios
570 Lacolle Way
Orleans ON  K4A 0N9
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
738 Notre-Dame Street
Embrun ON  K0A 1W1
Phone Number: (613) 443-3888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE JOANNE LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013