Levesque, Jerome (CPSO#: 60994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 420
33City Center Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone: (905) 569-7952
Fax: (905) 828-5136
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerome Levesque Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Levesque ( CPSO# 60994 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 569-7952

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990