Levesque, Kristine Janik (CPSO#: 96417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINE JANIK LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2017