Levesque, Roger (CPSO#: 65651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2442
Fax: (613) 961-2503
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1994