Levesque, Stefan Marc-Andre (CPSO#: 70077)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 24 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 1998