Levin, Adeera (CPSO#: 54578)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991