Levin, Alex Van (CPSO#: 61447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wills Eye Hospital
Department Pediatric Ophthalmology
and Ocular Genetics Suite 1210
840 Walnut Street
Philadelphia PA  19107-5109
United States
Phone: (215) 928-3914
Fax: (215) 928-3983

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Jersey
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX VAN LEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1992
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 May 1994